TN SB3460 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-05 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 3 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3620 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee