TN HB3427 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a presumption that each parent age 18 or older has knowledge of a parent's legal and moral obligation to support his or her child or children. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-102.
Title
As enacted, establishes a presumption that each parent age 18 or older has knowledge of a parent's legal and moral obligation to support his or her child or children. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924 | |
2010-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/10 | |
2010-04-19 | Reset on cal. reg cal for 4/26/10 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Mtg. cancelled, Action def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/16/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3002 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 924
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3427&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3427.pdf |