TN SB3002 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a presumption that each parent age 18 or older has knowledge of a parent's legal and moral obligation to support his or her child or children. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-102.
Title
As enacted, establishes a presumption that each parent age 18 or older has knowledge of a parent's legal and moral obligation to support his or her child or children. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-102.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Pub. Ch. 924 | |
2010-05-28 | Effective date(s) 05/26/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-14 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-10 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-05-06 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-26 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1308) | |
2010-04-26 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-03-25 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-22 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/16/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3427 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924