TN HB2981 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes that boating regulation laws will govern unclaimed or abandoned boats and vessels when in conflict with the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 29.
Title
As enacted, establishes that boating regulation laws will govern unclaimed or abandoned boats and vessels when in conflict with the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 756 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-31 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-29 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-29 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3064 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2981&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2981.pdf |