TN SB3064 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes that boating regulation laws will govern unclaimed or abandoned boats and vessels when in conflict with the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 29.
Title
As enacted, establishes that boating regulation laws will govern unclaimed or abandoned boats and vessels when in conflict with the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756 | |
2010-03-29 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2981 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 756