TN HB2890 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the legislative body of Coffee County to impose an entertainment event fee on the sale and distribution of tickets to events in the county with an expected attendance of 500 persons or more.
Title
AN ACT relative to an entertainment event fee for certain events held in Coffee County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Pr. Ch. 53 | |
2022-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate requested the return for further consideration. |
2022-03-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2911 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 53