TN SB2911 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the legislative body of Coffee County to impose an entertainment event fee on the sale and distribution of tickets to events in the county with an expected attendance of 500 persons or more.
Title
AN ACT relative to an entertainment event fee for certain events held in Coffee County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 53 | |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2890 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 53