TN HB2878 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that for purposes of air quality control, all equipment used in the process of producing nonmetallic materials contained within an aggregate processing facility or asphalt plant, including crushers, screens, conveyors, and feeders, is considered one air contaminant source. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to air contaminant sources.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-08 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action def. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2708 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Refer to Senate Calendar Committee