TN HB2868 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Effective date(s) 05/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Effective date(s) 05/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits Memphis and Nashville, with regard to hotel motel taxes, having a preexisting privilege tax or authority, from changing the designated use; authorizes those municipalities to otherwise change the allocations of the revenue, except in accordance with and subject to any other restrictions of state law relative to accommodations for transients and hotel occupancy. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14, relative to tax revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2024 | |
2024-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1001 | |
2024-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0990) |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2711 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1001