TN HB2820 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell general obligations bonds of the state in amounts not to exceed $124 million.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell general obligations bonds of the state in amounts not to exceed $124 million.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2020-04-06 | Effective date(s) 04/02/2020 | |
2020-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2469 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649