TN HB2706 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state treasurer, in conjunction with the commissioner of transportation, to develop, implement, and administer a centralized information system for the reporting of alleged dangerous conditions on state-maintained highways and the repair of such conditions. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4, relative to claims administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/05/2022 | |
2022-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 1004 | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0924) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0918) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0678) |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2678 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1004