TN SB2678 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state treasurer, in conjunction with the commissioner of transportation, to develop, implement, and administer a centralized information system for the reporting of alleged dangerous conditions on state-maintained highways and the repair of such conditions. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4, relative to claims administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1004 | |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2706 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2022