TN HB2685 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a process for members of a county legislative body and members of the public to challenge a vote of a member of the county legislative body if that member, or the member's spouse, is an employee of the county and voted on a matter that would increase the pay or benefits of that member or that member's spouse. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 5, relative to county legislative bodies.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-08 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 86, Nays 2 PNV 0 HB2685 |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0668) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2548 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Companion House Bill substituted