TN HB2675 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Buildings Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Buildings Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2837 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee