TN SB2837 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Buildings Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Buildings Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 17; Title 56, Chapter 4; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2675 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Reassigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee