TN HB2620 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a legal proceeding arising out of the LEA's adoption of a policy or practice designating multi-person restrooms, locker rooms, or other facilities for use based only on one's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a legal proceeding arising out of the LEA's adoption of a policy or practice designating multi-person restrooms, locker rooms, or other facilities for use based only on one's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2480 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second