TN SB2480 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a legal proceeding arising out of the LEA's adoption of a policy or practice designating multi-person restrooms, locker rooms, or other facilities for use based only on one's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, expands the attorney general and reporter's duties to include representation of an LEA or certain LEA employees in a legal proceeding arising out of the LEA's adoption of a policy or practice designating multi-person restrooms, locker rooms, or other facilities for use based only on one's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2620 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee