TN HB2619 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, generally prohibits the department from using state funds to administer hormone replacement therapy to state inmates incarcerated in a state penitentiary or a county jail or workhouse, or for sex reassignment surgery for state inmates incarcerated in a state penitentiary or a county jail or workhouse. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to the department of correction.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821 | |
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2024-03-14 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2861 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024