TN HB2603 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires persons subject to licensure as emergency medical services personnel to notify the emergency medical services board of convictions and pending charges of commission of a felony or misdemeanor within 10 business days of the occurrence of such actions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, requires persons subject to licensure as emergency medical services personnel to notify the emergency medical services board of convictions and pending charges of commission of a felony or misdemeanor within 10 business days of the occurrence of such actions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 2, 3 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 3 by Bailey (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 3 by Bailey (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 861 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-23 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2, 3 Ayes 95, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2603 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment #3 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Tabling motion lifted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | H. returned. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0752) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0732) |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2675 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861