TN SB2675 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires persons subject to licensure as emergency medical services personnel to notify the emergency medical services board of convictions and pending charges of commission of a felony or misdemeanor within 10 business days of the occurrence of such actions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, requires persons subject to licensure as emergency medical services personnel to notify the emergency medical services board of convictions and pending charges of commission of a felony or misdemeanor within 10 business days of the occurrence of such actions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Recalled from House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/19/18 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0671) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2603 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 861