TN HB2597 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the provisions of law regarding denial of a driver license or learner's permit to persons under 18 who are not enrolled in and making satisfactory progress in high school. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, removes the provisions of law regarding denial of a driver license or learner's permit to persons under 18 who are not enrolled in and making satisfactory progress in high school. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2576 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Failed in Senate Education Committee