TN SB2576 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the provisions of law regarding denial of a driver license or learner's permit to persons under 18 who are not enrolled in and making satisfactory progress in high school. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, removes the provisions of law regarding denial of a driver license or learner's permit to persons under 18 who are not enrolled in and making satisfactory progress in high school. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee