TN HB2578 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a governmental entity from authorizing the destruction of public records subject to disclosure if the governmental entity knows the records are subject to a pending public record request submitted to the governmental entity. - Amends amend TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a governmental entity from authorizing the destruction of public records subject to disclosure if the governmental entity knows the records are subject to a pending public record request submitted to the governmental entity. - Amends amend TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2313 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 738