TN SB2313 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a governmental entity from authorizing the destruction of public records subject to disclosure if the governmental entity knows the records are subject to a pending public record request submitted to the governmental entity. - Amends amend TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a governmental entity from authorizing the destruction of public records subject to disclosure if the governmental entity knows the records are subject to a pending public record request submitted to the governmental entity. - Amends amend TCA Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 6 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-16 | House | Motion to reconsider failed. |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0951) |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0860) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0594) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0670) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0676) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2578 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738