TN HB2567 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to the Election Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2438 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee