TN HB2531 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund, board of trustees, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 11, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, extends the Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund, board of trustees, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 11, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-13 | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-07 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/13/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2335 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-13 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.