TN HB2479 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 807
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 807
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes one of two similar options for the purchase of a lifetime sportsman license for senior citizens, the fee for which cannot be automatically adjusted to reflect the same percentage increase as the annual sportsman license. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, deletes one of two similar options for the purchase of a lifetime sportsman license for senior citizens, the fee for which cannot be automatically adjusted to reflect the same percentage increase as the annual sportsman license. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 807 | |
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2771 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 807