TN HB2469 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from five to 10 years the period of time the department of agriculture shall maintain records that are created by or submitted to the department for the regulation of hemp. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2796 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee