TN SB2796 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from five to 10 years the period of time the department of agriculture shall maintain records that are created by or submitted to the department for the regulation of hemp. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2469 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.