TN HB2411 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits retaliatory discharge of employees under the Tennessee workers' compensation law under certain circumstances; prescribes certain damages available to prevailing plaintiffs under retaliatory discharge claims. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, prohibits retaliatory discharge of employees under the Tennessee workers' compensation law under certain circumstances; prescribes certain damages available to prevailing plaintiffs under retaliatory discharge claims. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2543 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee