TN SB2543 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits retaliatory discharge of employees under the Tennessee workers' compensation law under certain circumstances; prescribes certain damages available to prevailing plaintiffs under retaliatory discharge claims. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, prohibits retaliatory discharge of employees under the Tennessee workers' compensation law under certain circumstances; prescribes certain damages available to prevailing plaintiffs under retaliatory discharge claims. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2411 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee