TN HB2409 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires organizations to use high-quality instructional materials to be eligible for a LEAP grant; gives preference in the award of LEAP grants to applicants offering summer programs focused on closing literacy gaps among students entering grades one through three. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, requires organizations to use high-quality instructional materials to be eligible for a LEAP grant; gives preference in the award of LEAP grants to applicants offering summer programs focused on closing literacy gaps among students entering grades one through three. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee