TN HB2368 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the "Residential Infrastructure Development Act of 2024." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 84; Title 9, Chapter 21; Title 66, Chapter 5 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 84; Title 9, Chapter 21; Title 66, Chapter 5 and Title 67, relative to residential infrastructure development districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 860 | |
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2315 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024