TN HB2359 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that confidential medical information must not be disclosed in the accounting statement of a fiduciary when the fiduciary advises the court whether or not the condition of the respondent continues to require the fiduciary's services. - Amends TCA Title 34; Title 35 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 34; Title 35 and Title 67, relative to fiduciaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 945 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1799 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 945