TN HB2347 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the comptroller of the treasury, in conjunction with the bureau of TennCare and the department of health, to study the use of temporary staffing provided by healthcare staffing agencies in long-term care facilities; requires that the study examine the effects that costs of temporary staffing have upon the TennCare program and upon assisted-care living facilities, and practices that may improve the quality of long-term care for residents while reducing costs to the TennCare program. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to temporary healthcare staffing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1118 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Action def. to Study Calendar |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2463 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022