TN HB2230 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the calendar week that includes October 28 as the "Reverend Kelly Miller Smith, Sr. Week of Service." - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2 and Title 49, relative to the Reverend Kelly Miller Smith, Sr. Week of Service.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842 | |
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2006 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024