TN HB2219 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires this state to match the federal funds appropriated to Tennessee State University at a rate that is two times the rate required by the federal government for receipt of the funds. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9 and Title 49, relative to funding for federal land-grant institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1990 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate Education Committee