TN HB2206 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that memorial signs commemorating service members killed in action contain the language "KIA", name and rank of the service member, name of war or conflict in which the service member was killed, and the Purple Heart emblem. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, requires that memorial signs commemorating service members killed in action contain the language "KIA", name and rank of the service member, name of war or conflict in which the service member was killed, and the Purple Heart emblem. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2577 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee