TN HB2199 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires arresting agency to send fingerprint cards for DUI and other vehicular impairment offense arrests to TBI within five days of arrest for submission to NCIC and requires the clerks to send DUI convictions to TBI within seven days of conviction. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, requires arresting agency to send fingerprint cards for DUI and other vehicular impairment offense arrests to TBI within five days of arrest for submission to NCIC and requires the clerks to send DUI convictions to TBI within seven days of conviction. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718 | |
2016-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2016-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2577 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 718
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2199&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2199.pdf |