TN HB2163 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the words "or fuel-fired appliances" in exception 2 of R501.3 of the 2012 IRC will be disregarded by any state or local government official in determining the applicability of the provision to any residential construction prior to January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Section 68-120-101.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the words "or fuel-fired appliances" in exception 2 of R501.3 of the 2012 IRC will be disregarded by any state or local government official in determining the applicability of the provision to any residential construction prior to January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Section 68-120-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 679 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/14/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-31 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-31 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-31 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0939) |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2282 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679