TN HB2142 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class B misdemeanor the penalty for a student's parent, guardian, or legal custodian failing to report an adjudication that the student committed certain delinquent acts to the school principal; specifies that a school principal shall ask a student's parent, guardian, or legal custodian whether there has been any such adjudication. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to students who have been adjudicated delinquent.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Martin [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-22 | Pub. Ch. 721 | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2365 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721