TN HB2049 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires all state agencies and political subdivisions to verify eligibility of all individuals 18 years of age or older before providing public benefits by using the federal "systematic alien verification for entitlements" or "SAVE" program, with limited exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39.
Title
As introduced, requires all state agencies and political subdivisions to verify eligibility of all individuals 18 years of age or older before providing public benefits by using the federal "systematic alien verification for entitlements" or "SAVE" program, with limited exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-09 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0122 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2049&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2049.pdf |