TN SB0122 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires all state agencies and political subdivisions to verify eligibility of all individuals 18 years of age or older before providing public benefits by using the federal "systematic alien verification for entitlements" or "SAVE" program, with limited exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires all state agencies and political subdivisions to verify eligibility of all individuals 18 years of age or older before providing public benefits by using the federal "systematic alien verification for entitlements" or "SAVE" program, with limited exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-02 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2049 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback