TN HB2047 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds former public officials to the list of officials who may contest liens on real property believed to lack any legal basis. - Amends TCA Section 47-9-513 and Title 66, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 47-9-513 and Title 66, Chapter 21, Part 1, relative to real property interests.
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 744 | |
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1646 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 744