TN HB2043 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the grocery tax; enacts the "Business Enterprise Tax Act"; and enacts the "Worldwide Combined Reporting Act." - Amends TCA Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57 and Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Aftyn Behn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-11 | House | Ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with a Neutral Recommendation |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2024 |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for Review - Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1934 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024