TN HB2033 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the threshold at which assessments and indebtedness, as a percentage of the fair market value of a subject property, affect the eligibility of the property to participate under the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act; adds property owned by certain kinds of organizations to the definition of "commercial property"; makes other changes related to the Act. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 205.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 205, relative to the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1990 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022