TN SB1990 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the threshold at which assessments and indebtedness, as a percentage of the fair market value of a subject property, affect the eligibility of the property to participate under the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act; adds property owned by certain kinds of organizations to the definition of "commercial property"; makes other changes related to the Act. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 205.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 205, relative to the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 868 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0714) |
2022-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0553) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2033 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 868