TN HB2028 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes beer retailers to sell beer, from their own inventory, online for curbside pickup at the beer retailer's location; requires that the employee bringing beer to a vehicle for curbside pickup verify that the recipient of the beer is 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-103.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes beer retailers to sell beer, from their own inventory, online for curbside pickup at the beer retailer's location; requires that the employee bringing beer to a vehicle for curbside pickup verify that the recipient of the beer is 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-103.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Pub. Ch. 704
2020-07-02 Effective date(s) 06/22/2020
2020-06-22 Signed by Governor.
2020-06-18HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-06-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-06-10SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 21, Nays 1
2020-06-10SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-16SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-03-12HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-12HousePassed H., Ayes 72, Nays 17, PNV 7
2020-03-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020
2020-02-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2020-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2020-02-03HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2020-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2487 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 704

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback