TN SB2487 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes beer retailers to sell beer, from their own inventory, online for curbside pickup at the beer retailer's location; requires that the employee bringing beer to a vehicle for curbside pickup verify that the recipient of the beer is 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-103.
Title
As enacted, authorizes beer retailers to sell beer, from their own inventory, online for curbside pickup at the beer retailer's location; requires that the employee bringing beer to a vehicle for curbside pickup verify that the recipient of the beer is 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-5-103.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 704 | |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2028 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 704