TN HB2022 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires department's case managers to report a suspected violation of a court order to law enforcement in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Section 39-13-113.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37 and Section 39-13-113, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1912 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022